FL S1202 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 897 -SJ 1269
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 897 -SJ 1269
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision for the limitation of actions against a bond; requiring that the bond number be stated on the first page of the bond; requiring that the state, a county, a municipality, or any other public body or institution open sealed bids received in response to a competitive solicitation at a public meeting, announce the name of each bidder and the price submitted, and make available upon request the names of bidders and submitted prices; revising requirements for demands for a copy of a construction contract and a statement of account; requiring that a contractor serve rather than mail a notice of contest of claim against the payment bond and a notice of bond, etc.
Title
Construction Liens and Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 897 -SJ 1269 | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1269 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 874 | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 874 | |
2012-02-21 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 534 | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-13 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time -SJ 504 | |
2012-02-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-09 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 97 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Judiciary; Budget -SJ 97 | |
2011-12-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
255 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 0518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |