FL S1202 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Joint Rules of the Florida Legislature for the 2010-2012 term.
Title
Joint Rules of the Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 181 | |
2011-03-09 | Substituted for HCR 7015 -HJ 173 | |
2011-03-08 | In Messages | |
2011-03-08 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/11 | |
2011-02-24 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7015 () 2011-03-09 - Substituted SCR 1202