FL S1200 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a state agency to enter into a pay-for-success contract with a private entity under certain circumstances; specifying the duties of the state agency; requiring the private entity to annually report to the state agency, etc.
Title
Pay-for-Success Contract Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1049 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee