FL S1194 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a defendant who is sentenced for a primary offense of possession of a controlled substance committed on or after a specified date to be sentenced to a nonstate prison sanction under certain circumstances unless the court makes specified written findings; authorizing a defendant to move the sentencing court to depart from a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment or a mandatory fine if the offense is committed on or after a specified date; revising a principle of the Criminal Punishment Code relating to a prisoner's required minimum term of imprisonment; revising the incentive gain-time that the Department of Corrections may grant a prisoner for offenses committed on or after a specified date; providing that persons convicted of a noncapital offense and sentenced for a term of life qualify for conditional release, subject to certain terms and conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H659 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S304 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9471405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback