FL S1192 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 601
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 601
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption from public records requirements for all records that relate to a client of a regional autism center who receives the services of a center or participates in center activities and the client's family. Provides for the release of specified confidential and exempt information by a center under certain circumstances. Provides an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of a donor or prospective donor to a regional autism center if the donor or prospective donor wishes to remain anonymous, etc.
Title
Public Records/Regional Autism Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 601 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-26 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time -SJ 483 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-18 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-14 | CS by- Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Regulation (112706); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-15 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 226 | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 226 | |
2011-03-09 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/14/11, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 89 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 89 | |
2011-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0579 () 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1163