FL S1184 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (? 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain governmental entities from charging stormwater management assessments or fees on certain bona fide farm operations except under certain circumstances; requiring that the portion of fuel sales tax collected from a county sheriff's office be returned to the sheriff's office to offset the ongoing fuel costs; authorizing a sheriff's office that is licensed as a local government user to take a credit on the monthly diesel fuel tax return under prescribed conditions; revising the Florida Uniform Traffic Control Law to authorize the use of citrus harvesting equipment and citrus fruit loaders to transport certain agricultural products and to authorize the use of certain motor vehicles to transport citrus, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
2012-03-01 Now in Budget
2012-02-29 CS/CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax read 1st time -SJ 723
2012-02-28 Now in Budget -SJ 699
2012-02-28 CS/CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 699
2012-02-23 On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/28/12, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2012-02-21 CS/CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 537
2012-02-20 Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2012-02-20 Now in Budget -SJ 523
2012-02-17 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2012-02-16 CS/CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 523
2012-02-14 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/12, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2012-02-09 CS/CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 486
2012-02-09 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2012-02-07 CS/CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 484
2012-02-02 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/07/12, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2012-01-25 Now in Transportation -SJ 265
2012-01-24 CS by Agriculture read 1st time -SJ 274
2012-01-24 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2012-01-23 CS by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 265
2012-01-18 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/23/12, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 96
2012-01-10 Referred to Agriculture; Transportation; Budget -SJ 96
2011-12-07 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20641Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
580036Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback