FL S1180 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 979 -SJ 999
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 979 -SJ 999
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that comprehensive plan amendments proposing certain developments follow the state coordinated review process; providing an exemption from development-of-regional-impact review for proposed developments that meet specified criteria and are located in certain jurisdictions; requiring that an agreement under s. 288.106, F.S., which relates to a tax refund program for qualified target industry businesses, be executed as a condition for such exemption; revising conditions under which a local government is required to rescind a development-of-regional-impact development order; providing for application and approval of an amendment to the local comprehensive plan by the owner of land that meets certain criteria as an agricultural enclave; creating a 2-year permit extension, etc.
Title
Growth Management
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennett [R] | Senate Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | Senate Community Affairs Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 979 -SJ 999 | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time -SJ 999 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 874 | |
2012-03-01 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 750 | |
2012-03-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-28 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations, 02/28/12, 2:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-09 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2012-02-09 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-08 | Now in Budget -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 332 | |
2012-02-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-06 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 96 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 96 | |
2011-12-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |