FL S1176 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the acreage of wetlands and other surface waters subject to impact by dredge and fill activities under a state programmatic general permit; providing that seeking to use such a permit consents to specified federal wetland jurisdiction criteria; deleting certain conditions limiting when the department may assume federal permitting programs for the discharge of dredged or fill material, etc.
Title
Dredge and Fill Activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#813 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Chapter No. 2016-195 | |
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 795 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0795 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1176 (Ch. 2016-195)