FL S1176 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 505
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 505
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the apportionment of the House of Representatives and the Senate (plans H000H9049 and S000S9008); adopting the United States Decennial Census of 2010 for use in such apportionment; providing for the inclusion of omitted areas; providing contiguity for areas specified for inclusion in one district which are noncontiguous; specifying that the apportioned districts constitute the legislative districts of the state; providing for severability of invalid portions; providing for application beginning in 2012, etc.
Title
Joint Resolution of Apportionment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#669 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#670 (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#659 (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#660 (Y: 0 N: 118 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#657 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#658 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#669 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#670 (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#659 (Y: 80 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#660 (Y: 0 N: 118 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#657 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#658 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 505 | |
2012-02-09 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (601757) -SJ 405, 483 | |
2012-02-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-03 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 80 NAYS 37 -HJ 472 | |
2012-02-03 | Read 3rd time -HJ 472 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 328 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/12 | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 286 | |
2012-01-27 | Received -HJ 286 | |
2012-01-17 | In Messages | |
2012-01-17 | Immediately certified -SJ 171 | |
2012-01-17 | Read 2nd time -SJ 170 | |
2012-01-13 | CS by Reapportionment read 1st time -SJ 166 | |
2012-01-12 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/17/12 | |
2012-01-11 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 136 | |
2012-01-11 | CS by- Reapportionment; YEAS 22 NAYS 4 -SJ 136 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 95 | |
2011-12-30 | On Committee agenda-- Reapportionment, 01/11/12, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-12-16 | Referred to Reapportionment -SJ 95 | |
2011-12-06 | Filed | |
2011-12-06 | SPB 7034 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1176) by Reapportionment |