FL S1174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Chapter No. 2016-74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Chapter No. 2016-74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying applicability of siting requirements for community residential homes; providing applicability with respect to local land use and zoning, etc.
Title
Residential Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#673 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Chapter No. 2016-74 | |
2016-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 885 |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-02-25 | House | Received |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/18/16 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/10/16, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0885 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1174 (Ch. 2016-74)