FL S1168 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 989 (Ch. 2016-201)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 989 (Ch. 2016-201)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a minimum specified amount of funds within the Land Acquisition Trust Fund to be appropriated for Everglades restoration projects; providing a preference in the use of funds to certain projects that reduce harmful discharges to the St. Lucie Estuary and the Caloosahatchee Estuary; requiring a minimum specified amount of funds within the Land Acquisition Trust Fund to be appropriated for spring restoration, protection, and management projects, etc.
Title
Implementation of the Water and Land Conservation Constitutional Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 989 (Ch. 2016-201) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Substituted HB 989 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/16 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/29/16, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-02-11 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/09/16, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0989 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Chapter No. 2016-201