FL S1168 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignating the ports to be benefitted by the Florida Seaport Transportation and Economic Development Program; requiring the Department of Transportation to request a specified minimum amount of funding for the Florida Seaport Transportation and Economic Development Program in its annual budget request; creating the Strategic Port Investment Initiative; establishing procedures for designating a facility as part of the Strategic Intermodal System, etc.
Title
Freight Mobility Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch. | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 902 | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 902 | |
2012-02-22 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2012-02-22 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 674 | |
2012-02-21 | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time -SJ 536 | |
2012-02-20 | Now in Budget -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-16 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-16 | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/16/12, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 274 | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Commerce and Tourism -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-23 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-19 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 95 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Transportation; Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 95 | |
2011-12-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
311 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |