FL S1156 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the STEM Teacher Loan Forgiveness Program; providing for student eligibility and the use of funds, etc.
Title
STEM Teacher Loan Forgiveness Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0631 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1156 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1156/BillText/Filed/HTML |