FL S1142 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Florida Veterans Employment Act"; establishing a tax credit for hiring veterans; establishing an additional credit for hiring disabled veterans; revising the order in which credits against the corporate income tax or franchise tax may be taken to include credits for hiring veterans; revising the term "adjusted federal income" to include certain tax credits taken relating to hiring veterans, etc.
Title
Tax Credit for Hiring Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0995 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1142 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1142/BillText/Filed/HTML |