FL S1138 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a public high school student from leaving school grounds during his or her designated lunch period. Requires that district school boards implement the prohibition by a specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public High School Students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 85
2011-03-01 Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 85
2011-02-16 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0791 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback