FL S1134 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 893 (Ch. 2015-124)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the types of individuals and entities which are eligible for blanket health insurance coverage; limiting the types of insurance coverages that may be provided to specified groups, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blanket Health Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 893 (Ch. 2015-124)
2015-04-22SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 893
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-21SenateCS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
2015-04-17SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/15
2015-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-17SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-15SenateCS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-04-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-06SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-04-02SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-23SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2015-03-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2015-03-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-17SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0893 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-124

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627659Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback