FL S1134 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising provisions requiring development, maintenance, and reporting relating to an automated inventory of state-owned or state-occupied facilities and providing procedures, requirements, and departmental responsibilities with respect thereto; authorizing the Department of Management Services to direct state agencies to occupy space in a state-owned building; authorizing the department to implement renovations of projects in order to efficiently use state-owned buildings; reducing the amount of square feet that an agency may lease without department approval; requiring the lessor of certain state-leased space to provide documentation relating to compliance with uniform firesafety standards under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-owned or Leased Space

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2012-02-02 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/07/12, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 92
2012-01-10 Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 92
2011-12-02 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2160152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255248Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255249Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985682Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback