FL S1122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use or operation of a drone by certain offenders for the purpose of viewing or recording an image of a minor in specified locations, etc.
Title
Use or Operation of a Drone by Certain Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0939 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
810 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1122 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1122/BillText/Filed/HTML |