FL S1118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a governmental unit that contracts for the construction, repair, remodeling, or improving of a facility from imposing conditions that requires, prohibits, encourages, or discourages certain bidders, contractors, or subcontractors from entering into or adhering to agreements with a collective bargaining organization; prohibiting certain terms from being placed in bid specifications, project agreements, or other controlling documents; revising the period during which an agency must file a protest following certain contract solicitations or awards, etc.
Title
Public Contracting
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/14/13, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0181 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1118 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1118/BillText/Filed/HTML |