FL S1104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring service on financial institutions to be made in accordance with s. 655.0201, F.S.; revising applicability of provisions of law governing service of process on financial institutions; authorizing certain financial institutions to designate with the Department of State a place or registered agent within the state as the sole location or agent for service of process, notice, levy, or demand, etc.
Title
Service of Process on Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#803 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Chapter No. 2016-180 | |
2016-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 897 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/16/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0897 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1104 (Ch. 2016-180)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |