FL S1104 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Substitutes the Arc of Florida for the Association for Retarded Citizens for purposes of certain proceedings relating to children. Substitutes the term "intellectual disability" for the term "mental retardation." Clarifies in provisions that the meaning of the terms "intellectual disability" or "intellectually disabled" is the same as the meaning of the terms "mental retardation," "retarded," and "mentally retarded" for purposes of matters relating to the criminal laws and court rules, etc.
Title
Intellectual Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 82 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 82 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
650 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
86 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
914 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
914 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 3012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
918 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
941 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
984 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1104 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1104/BillText/Filed/HTML |