FL S1102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that electric utilities meet or exceed specified standards for the production or purchase of clean energy. Requires that the Solar Energy Center charge testing fees. Imposes a fee on alternative fuel containing alcohol. Requires that the Florida Energy and Climate Commission prepare a report identifying ways to increase the energy-efficiency practices of low-income households, etc.
Title
Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 81 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 82 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1724 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
366 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 6015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
525 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1102 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1102/BillText/Filed/HTML |