FL S1096 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to monitor certain consumptive use permits; providing penalties for nonpayment of fees; directing the department to adopt rules, etc.
Title
Bottled Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Agriculture; Rules |
2019-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1098 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources