FL S1094 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying requirements for the coastal management element required for a local government comprehensive plan; requiring a surveyor and mapper to submit a copy of each elevation certificate that he or she completes to the Division of Emergency Management within a specified period beginning on a specified date; authorizing the redaction of certain personal information from the copy; deleting a provision that prohibits supplemental flood insurance from including excess coverage over any other insurance covering the peril of flood, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peril of Flood

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#308 (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-69
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 89 NAYS 26
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 895
2015-04-22HouseReceived
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-22HouseIn Messages
2015-04-22SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-04-22SenateAmendment(s) adopted (649738)
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-14SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-14SenateAmendment(s) adopted (437608)
2015-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-07SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2015-04-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-03SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-02SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-25SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-24SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2015-03-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-23SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-03-17SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2015-03-12SenateNow in Community Affairs
2015-03-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-10SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules
2015-02-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0895 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1094 (Ch. 2015-69)
S0678 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1094 (Ch. 2015-69)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633178Amended CodeSee Bill Text
195088Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4720366Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627715Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/591894/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/657366/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/611562/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/114946/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/748102/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/300284/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/764602/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/955694/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/437608/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/489548/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Amendment/649738/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Vote/SenateVote_s1094e1025.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1094/Vote/HouseVote_s1094e2308.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback