FL S1080 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposing an additional penalty for certain traffic violations; requiring municipalities and counties to transfer certain moneys collected to the Emergency Medical Services Trust Fund of the Department of Health; requiring the Department of Health to seek federal matching funds for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Emergency Air Medical Service
Sponsors
Sen. John Legg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1421 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 2515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1080 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1080/BillText/Filed/HTML |