FL S1076 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Protect Florida Small Business Act"; prohibiting a franchisor from terminating or not renewing a franchise under certain circumstances; prohibiting a franchisor from denying certain persons the opportunity to participate in the ownership of a franchise for a specified period after the death of the franchisee or the death of a person controlling a majority interest in the franchise; requiring a franchisor and a franchisee to deal with each other in good faith; prohibiting waivers through certain contract provisions that would affect a person's rights to make a claim, etc.
Title
Franchises
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 5 NAYS 4 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/30/18, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1219 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
686 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |