FL S1074 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "HIV Prevention Justice Act"; reducing the degree of criminal penalty for certain persons who are infected with human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) and who donate blood, plasma, organs, skin, or other human tissue for use in another person; revising prohibitions relating to the intentional transmission of certain diseases through sexual conduct; providing that a person's failure to comply with behavioral recommendations does not de facto establish intent to transmit a disease, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIV Prevention Justice Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-12-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Rules
2021-11-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H787 (Similar To) 2022-01-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H813 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1468 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38434Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750877Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback