FL S1060 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 809 -SJ 1216
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 809 -SJ 1216
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Communications Services Tax Working Group; housing the working group in the Department of Revenue for administrative purposes, etc.
Title
Communications Services Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Ellyn Bogdanoff [R] | Senate Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | Senate Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee |
Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 809 -SJ 1216 | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1216 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 956 | |
2012-02-27 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax read 1st time -SJ 686 | |
2012-02-27 | Now in Budget -SJ 685 | |
2012-02-23 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 685 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/23/12, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-08 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-02-08 | Now in Budget -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-07 | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 331 | |
2012-02-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-06 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time -SJ 305 | |
2012-01-31 | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2012-01-30 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-30 | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 01/30/12, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 86 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 86 | |
2011-11-22 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
202 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
203 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
610 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |