FL S1048 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for appointment of an advocate for the interests of an animal in certain court proceedings, at the discretion of the court; providing powers and duties of such advocates; requiring the Animal Law Section of the Florida Bar to maintain a list of attorneys and certified legal interns meeting specified requirements who are eligible to be appointed as such advocates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courtroom Animal Advocates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-15SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-14SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Agriculture; Judiciary; Rules
2019-11-25SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
828035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback