FL S1048 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a motor vehicle dealer who received approval of a facility from an applicant or licensee within a specified timeframe is deemed to be in full compliance with facility-related requirements; revising provisions related to an applicant or licensee who has undertaken or engaged in an audit of service-related payments or incentive payments; reducing the timeframe for the performance of such audits, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Manufacturer Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Received |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 4 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Rules |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0921 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 641 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 642 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 643 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 69913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |