FL S1046 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the Division of Forestry within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services as the "Florida Forest Service." Replaces the term "Division of Forestry" with the term "Florida Forest Service" and replaces the term "division" with the term "agency." Makes conforming changes.
Title
Florida Forest Service/DOACS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-28 | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 561 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 79 | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-28 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/07/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Agriculture; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 79 | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0735 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 10521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
260 | 0142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
261 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
261 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
261 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
261 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 0010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 0016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 548 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 549 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 1843 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 277 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
591 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
591 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
591 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
591 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
591 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
591 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
591 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1046 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1046/BillText/Filed/HTML |