FL S1044 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as "Allie's Law"; defining the term "treatment provider"; providing immunity from criminal and civil liability for certain persons and entities who report animal cruelty; prohibiting the alteration or destruction of certain records, etc.
Title
Animal Cruelty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H621 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee