FL S1044 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an operator or proprietor of a tanning facility from allowing a minor to use a tanning device at the tanning facility; deleting a provision that authorizes the use of a tanning device by certain minors if accompanied by a parent or legal guardian, etc.
Title
Tanning Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health Regulation | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 85 | |
2011-12-08 | Referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget -SJ 85 | |
2011-11-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1044 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1044/BillText/Filed/HTML |