FL S1044 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Terminates the International Registration Clearing Trust Fund within the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles. Provides for the disposition of balances in and revenues of the trust fund. Prescribes procedures for terminating the trust fund. Repeals provisions relating to an exemption from termination provided for the trust fund.
Title
International Registration Clearing TF/HSMV
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#115 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 417 | |
2011-04-06 | Substituted for HB 7059 -HJ 428 | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/06/11 | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 380 | |
2011-03-15 | In Messages | |
2011-03-15 | Read 2nd time -SJ 220 | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 78 | |
2011-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/23/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-02-11 | SPB 7046 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1044) by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H7059 () 2011-04-06 - Substituted SB 1044