FL S1042 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1061
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1061
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Nature Coast Aquatic Preserve; designating the preserve for inclusion in the aquatic preserve system; outlining the authority of the Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund in respect to the preserve; prohibiting the establishment and management of the preserve from infringing upon the riparian rights of upland property owners adjacent to or within the preserve, etc.
Title
Aquatic Preserves
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1061 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1061 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1061 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-136
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1042 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1042/BillText/Filed/HTML |