FL S1036 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Terminating the administration of the Florida Comprehensive Assessment Test (FCAT) to students in grades 9 through 12; requiring the Preliminary SAT/National Merit Scholarship Qualifying Test (PSAT/NMSQT) or the ACT's EXPLORE and PLAN tests to replace the grade 10 FCAT for purposes of measuring a student's knowledge and skills; requiring students to take the PSAT/NMSQT in grade 10 or the ACT's EXPLORE and PLAN tests in grades 9 and 10, respectively; requiring students to earn passing scores on the PSAT/NMSQT or the ACT's EXPLORE and PLAN tests to qualify for a standard high school diploma; requiring the State Board of Education to designate passing scores; requiring use of student performance on the PSAT/NMSQT or the ACT's EXPLORE and PLAN tests for school grading purposes; providing for application beginning with students entering grade 9 in the 2013-2014 school year, etc.
Title
Student Assessment in the Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 85 | |
2011-12-08 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget -SJ 85 | |
2011-11-18 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1036 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1036/BillText/Filed/HTML |