FL S1036 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes a limitation upon the imposition of indigent care and trauma center discretionary sales surtaxes by certain counties. Authorizes the governing boards of certain counties to levy the surtaxes only pursuant to a referendum.
Title
Discretionary Sales Surtaxes [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-20 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00651 | |
2010-04-19 | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; CS read 1st time on 04/20/10 -SJ 00654 | |
2010-04-16 | Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00599; On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 110-S | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-13 | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00605 | |
2010-04-09 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00523; On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 301-S | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Regulation (880454); YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Finance and Tax; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00073 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Health Regulation; Finance and Tax; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-12-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0767 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council