FL S1024 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting website operators from using specified information in the sale of certain tickets, etc.
Title
Ticket Websites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H601 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
501 | 9735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |