FL S1020 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Chief Inspector General to publish final investigative reports in a specified manner within a certain timeframe; requiring final investigative reports of inspectors general to be published on an agency website within a certain timeframe; defining the term "unit of local government"; requiring specified reports of local governments to be published online within a certain timeframe, etc.
Title
Inspectors General
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/14, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0855 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
286 | 0015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1020 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1020/BillText/Filed/HTML |