FL S1018 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the annual budget of a multicondominium association may provide for an item that has a deferred maintenance expense or replacement cost that exceeds a specified amount if approved by the board, etc.
Title
Condominiums
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1018 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1018/BillText/Filed/HTML |