FL S1016 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising legislative findings to include digital devices and home-based Internet connectivity in infrastructure as necessary for a high-quality digital learning environment; requiring each school district to adopt a digital learning plan; requiring school districts to submit plans to the Department of Education by a certain date in a format prescribed by the department; requiring the department to develop one or more state term contracts for a specified purpose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital Learning

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Education
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2021-02-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H985 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003499Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback