FL S1016 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department to implement an asset verification service to verify eligibility for public assistance; requiring CareerSource Florida, Inc., to include certain data relating to the performance outcomes of local workforce development boards and associated pilot programs in an annual report to the Governor and Legislature; requiring CareerSource Florida, Inc., to submit a comprehensive report on the outcome of the pilot program to the Governor and Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Family Self-sufficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0581 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
S570 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2017-151)
H23 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2017-151)
S570 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2017-151)
H23 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2017-151)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
414 | 393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1016 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1016/BillText/Filed/HTML |