FL S1016 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the creation of a special thoroughbred race meet designated as the "Breeders' Cup Permanent Meet" which shall be conducted annually at the facility of a Florida horseracing permitholder; prohibiting races at certain thoroughbred facilities during the meet; providing a tax credit as compensation for race days lost due to the prohibition; providing that the permitholder conducting the Breeders' Cup Permanent Meet is exempt from paying taxes on the handle for Breeders' Cup races under the permit; providing the permitholder with certain tax credits to be used for certain purposes; authorizing the permitholder to receive a license to operate slot machines at the facility identified in the Breeders' Cup Permit under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Thoroughbred Horse Breeders' Cup Meets
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 84 | |
2011-12-08 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Budget; Rules -SJ 84 | |
2011-11-18 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1016 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1016/BillText/Filed/HTML |