FL S1012 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing terms for certain consumer loans made by licensees; specifying authorized amounts of certain fees and charges; authorizing a borrower to rescind an installment loan within a specified period; requiring the licensee to refund or credit the borrower certain charges under specified conditions; prohibiting a licensee from making payments to a person as a reward for referring loan applications to the licensee under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Consumer Loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1081 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
516 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1012 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1012/BillText/Filed/HTML |