FL S1006 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring nicotine product manufacturers who sell nicotine dispensing products in this state to execute and deliver a form, under penalty of perjury, to the Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation for each dispensing device sold within this state which meets certain criteria; providing penalties for certain violations by manufacturers; prohibiting the sale, shipment, or distributing of certain nicotine dispensing devices from being sold for retail sale in this state; providing criminal penalties for the unlawful sale or dealing of unlisted nicotine dispensing devices; providing for the seizure and destruction of unlawful nicotine dispensing devices in accordance with the Florida Contraband Forfeiture Act, etc.
Title
Nicotine Products and Dispensing Devices
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1007 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1007 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/20/24, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1007 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-127
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
569 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 346 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |