FL S1004 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7037 (Ch. 2021-26)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7037 (Ch. 2021-26)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for financial information of a private entity applicant which the Department of Transportation requires as part of an application process for loans or credit enhancements from the state-funded infrastructure bank; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/State-funded Infrastructure Bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7037 (Ch. 2021-26) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7004 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7037 (Ch. 2021-26)
H6099 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
H7037 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-26
H6099 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
H7037 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-26
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1004 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1004/BillText/Filed/HTML |