FL S1004 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 361
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing specified persons to visit, during certain hours, all facilities housing juveniles which are operated or overseen by the Department of Juvenile Justice or a county; authorizing such persons to visit the juvenile facilities outside of certain hours pursuant to department rules; prohibiting the department from unreasonably withholding permission for visits to such facilities by certain persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Persons Authorized to Visit Juvenile Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 361
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted CS/HB 361
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Rules
2017-11-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H361 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-47

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9856885Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback