FL S1002 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the accomplishments of the University of Florida and designating February 14, 2024, as "Gator Day" at the Capitol, etc.
Title
Gator Day
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8057 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Adopted by Publication
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1002 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1002/BillText/Filed/HTML |