FL S1002 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring each district school board to provide students in certain grades with a specified amount of consecutive minutes of free-play recess per day, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Recess

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Education Pre-K - 12
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-12-17SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-12-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0833 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003455Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback