FL S1000 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain buildings to have specified balcony guard openings, etc.
Title
Firesafety Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/17, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1105 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee